FL H7089 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7012 (Ch. 2015-73)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7012 (Ch. 2015-73)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal of public records exemption for credit history information & credit scores held by OFR for purposes of licensing loan originators, mortgage brokers, & mortgage lenders.
Title
OGSR/Credit History Information and Credit Scores/OFR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7012 (Ch. 2015-73) |
2015-04-21 | House | Substituted SB 7012 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7012 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-73
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7089 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7089/BillText/Filed/PDF |