FL S2512 | 2015 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-227, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-227, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the employer contribution rates for the retiree health insurance subsidy; revising the required employer retirement contribution rates for members of each membership class and subclass of the Florida Retirement System; providing findings of an important state interest, etc.
Title
Employer Contributions to Fund Retiree Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#439 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#406 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#406 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Chapter No. 2015-227, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232) | |
2015-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2015-06-19 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2015-06-19 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted (553906) |
2015-06-19 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2015-06-19 | House | In returning messages |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (553906) |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Lee (Chair), Benacquisto (Vice Chair), Flores (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Margolis (At Large), Richter (At Large), Simmons (At Large), Smith (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Negron (Chair), Bradley, Evers, Flores, Hutson, Joyner; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Education: Gaetz (Chair), Bullard, Galvano, Legg, Montford, Simmons, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Altman, Braynon, Dean, Margolis, Simpson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Garcia (Chair), Bean, Benacquisto, Grimsley, Richter, Smith, Sobel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Economic Development: Latvala (Chair), Brandes, Clemens, Detert, Diaz de la Portilla, Gibson, Hukill, Sachs, Thompson |
2015-06-05 | House | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Corcoran (Chair), Boyd (Vice Chair), Albritton (At Large), Caldwell (At Large), Diaz, J. (At Large), Eisnaugle (At Large), Fresen (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Goodson (At Large), Hudson (At Large), Ingram (At Large), McBurney (At Large), Metz (At Large), Nunez (At Large), Oliva (At Large), O'Toole (At Large), Porter (At Large), Raschein (At Large), Wood (At Large), Young (At Large), Clarke-Reed (At Large), Cruz (At Large), Jones, M. (At Large), Pafford (At Large), Richardson (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Stafford (At Large), Williams (At Large) |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In returning messages |
2015-06-04 | House | Refused to pass the Senate bill as passed by the Senate and acceded to the request for conference |
2015-06-04 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 106 NAYS 0 |
2015-06-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-06-04 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (924585) |
2015-06-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15 |
2015-06-03 | House | Received |
2015-06-03 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-06-01 | House | In Messages |
2015-06-01 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
H0005 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
H0005 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 363 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |