FL H0005 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increases employer contribution to retiree health insurance subsidy for members of state-administered plan; increases employer contribution to health insurance subsidy for members of Elected Officers' Class; increases employer contribution to health insurance subsidy for members of Senior Management Service Class; increases employer contribution to health insurance subsidy for members of Regular, Special Risk, & Special Risk Administrative Support Classes; revises amount of employer contributions to FRS for 2015-2016 fiscal year; provides findings of important state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-Administered Retirement Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
2015-06-04HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-01HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIntroduced
2015-05-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2512 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-227, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112363Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12171Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback