FL H0001 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides moneys for annual period beginning July 1, 2015, & ending June 30, 2016, & supplemental appropriations for period ending June 30, 2015, to pay salaries & other expenses, capital outlay-buildings & other improvements, & for other specified purposes of various agencies of state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Appropriations Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
2015-06-04HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-01HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIntroduced
2015-05-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
H0003 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
S2502 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-222, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229)
H0005 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
H0007 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223)
H0009 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225)
H0011 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226)
H0013 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
H0015 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
H0017 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
H0019 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2504 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-223, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2506 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-224, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2508 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-225, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2510 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-226, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2512 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-227, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2514 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-228, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2516 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-229, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
S2518 (Similar To) 2015-06-19 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2520 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-230, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2522 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-231, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2524 (Similar To) 2015-06-19 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback