FL S2124 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides procedures for filing petitions for benefits and other documents in worker's compensation benefits proceedings. Authorizes the Office of the Judges of Compensation Claims to adopt rules to implement electronic procedures. Requires a petitioner requesting an administrative hearing to include the petitioner's e-mail address. Requires an attorney to use electronic means when filing a document with said division, etc.
Title
Electronic Filing/Administrative Hearings Division [GPSC]
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/10/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00143 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00143 | |
2010-02-17 | SPB 7074 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2124) by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7159 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
H7163 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
H5611 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H7163 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
H5611 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0057 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 569 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 585 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0552 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0553 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0961 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |