FL H7163 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises governance of DMS; provides for electronic filing & transmission procedures for certain actions, proceedings, & petitions; repeals Florida State Employee Wellness Council; provides requirements for petitioners & respondents requesting administrative hearing; provides requirements for filing of documents with DOAH, etc.
Title
DMS Review/Florida Government Accountability Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died on Calendar | |
2010-03-29 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00425 | |
2010-03-26 | CS read 1st time on 03/26/10 -HJ 00405; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-25 | CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00410 | |
2010-03-23 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/25/10, 11:15 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-19 | Introduced -HJ 00347; Referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00347 | |
2010-03-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7159 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
S2124 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H5611 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S1238 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
S2124 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H5611 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S1238 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0020 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0057 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0110 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 569 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 585 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0216 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 712 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0552 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0553 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0961 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |