FL S2012 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Go Green license plate. Establishes an annual use fee for the plate and provides for the distribution of use fees received from the sale of the plate.
Title
Specialty License Plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-31 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/05/11, 10:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-03-23 | Introduced -SJ 271 | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Transportation; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 271 | |
2011-03-14 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/2012 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/2012/BillText/Filed/HTML |