FL S1828 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information in applications submitted to the Department of State by persons seeking certification as victims of Florida reform school abuse; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Victims of Florida Reform School Abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S288 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H265 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H265 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1828 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1828/BillText/Filed/HTML |