FL S1770 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Genetic Counseling Workforce Act"; providing licensure, licensure renewal, and continuing education requirements; requiring the Department of Health to adopt by rule continuing education requirements; prohibiting the licensing of a genetic counselor from being contingent on his or her participation in counseling that conflicts with his or her deeply held moral or religious beliefs; revising the definition of the term "health care practitioner" to include licensed genetic counselors, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetic Counseling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#397 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#47 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-28SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-28HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-28HouseCS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 1
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-26House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-04-26HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
2021-04-26HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 4
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-26SenateAmendment(s) adopted (303892, 967780)
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-22SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations; Rules
2021-03-29SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-25SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2021-03-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-24SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-03-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/24/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2021-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1772 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
H1233 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1770, 1st Eng.
H1235 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483913Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483918Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483919Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/Amendment/229656/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/Amendment/967780/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/Amendment/303892/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/Analyses/2021s01770.pre.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/Analyses/2021s01770.hp.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/Vote/SenateVote_s01770c1047.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/Vote/HouseVote_s01770e1397.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1770/Vote/2021-03-24%201130AM~S01770%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback