NY A04667 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-25 - signed chap.537
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-25 - signed chap.537
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health clubs accept cancellation of a membership within ten business days of receiving notice of the cancellation.
Title
Requires health clubs accept cancellation of a membership within ten business days of receiving notice of the cancellation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-25 | Assembly | signed chap.537 |
2024-11-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-05-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.111 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S932D |
2024-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4667b |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.129 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.343 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.343 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | print number 4667a |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2023-02-21 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00932 (Same As) 2024-05-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4667B