NY S00932 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4667B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health clubs accept cancellation of a membership within ten business days of receiving notice of the cancellation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health clubs accept cancellation of a membership within ten business days of receiving notice of the cancellation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-20SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A4667B
2024-04-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 932D
2024-04-04SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2024-04-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-04-04SenateRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2024-02-06Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2024-02-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-02-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-09SenateAMENDED 932C
2024-01-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.111
2024-01-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 932B
2024-01-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-06Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2023-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1361
2023-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-23SenatePRINT NUMBER 932A
2023-05-23SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2023-01-09SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A04667 (Same As) 2024-05-20 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S932
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00932&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00932
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00932&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00932A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00932&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00932B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00932&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00932C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00932&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00932D
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S932#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S932#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S932#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S932#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S932#SF3

Bill Comments

feedback