FL H1235 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOH to adopt by rule procedures for issuance & annual renewal of genetic counselor licenses, including specified application fee; authorizes DOH to waive payment of fee by rule; provides for deposit & use of fee proceeds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-07HouseAdded to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-04-01HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseReported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseAdded to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-28HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1233 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1770, 1st Eng.
S1772 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
S1770 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
483919Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback