FL S1772 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to adopt by rule procedures for the issuance and annual renewal of genetic counselor licenses, including a specified application fee; authorizing the department to waive payment of the fee by rule; providing for the deposit and use of fee proceeds, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/Genetic Counselor Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Appropriations
2021-03-29SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-25SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2021-03-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-24SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-03-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/24/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2021-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1770 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
H1235 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
H1233 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1770, 1st Eng.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
483919Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback