FL S1770 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Read 2nd time -SJ 791
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Read 2nd time -SJ 791
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises notice requirements relating to the termination of pregnancy of a minor. Provides exceptions to the notice requirements. Revises procedure for judicial waiver of notice. Provides for the minor to petition for a hearing within a specified time. Provides that in a hearing relating to waiving the requirement for parental notice, the court consider certain additional factors, including whether the minor's decision to terminate her pregnancy was due to undue influence. Provides a procedure for appeal if judicial waiver of notice is not granted, etc.
Title
Parental Notice of Abortion
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] | Sen. Steve Oelrich [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Read 2nd time -SJ 791 | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/04/11 | |
2011-05-02 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 672 | |
2011-04-25 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Judiciary (734128); YEAS 5 NAYS 2 -SJ 468 | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/25/11, 9:45 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-13 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/04/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Health Regulation; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 205 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1770 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1770/BillText/Filed/HTML |