FL S1746 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting hurricane shutters installed by qualified contractors from the sales and use tax; specifying that the exemption is available only through a refund of previously paid taxes; providing penalties for furnishing a false affidavit in the refund application, etc.
Title
Sales Tax Exemption for Hurricane Shutters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1746 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1746/BillText/Filed/HTML |