FL S1736 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 453
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 453
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a specified medical examination to serve as a certain required physical examination for firefighters; requiring an employing agency to maintain records of employee physical examinations for a specified period of time after employee separation from the agency; creating a presumption that applies to employees whose records are not maintained for that period of time, etc.
Title
Records of Physical Examinations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 453 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 453 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-26 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H453 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-114
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |