FL H0453 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes use of specified physical examination for presumption; requires fire service provider to maintain records of employee physical examinations for specified period; creates presumption if records are destroyed before that period has elapsed; requires employing agency to maintain records of employee physical examinations for specified period; creates presumption if records are destroyed before period has elapsed.
Title
Officer and Firefighter Physical Examination Requirements and Records
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Wyman Duggan [R] | Rep. Cord Byrd [R] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#668 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#667 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#668 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#667 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Chapter No. 2022-114 | |
2022-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1736 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-02-09 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2022-01-28 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-19 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-11-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 453
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |