FL S1736 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for business e-mail addresses of current justices and judges; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/E-mail Addresses of Current Justices and Judges

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Judiciary
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-15SenateIntroduced
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-03-03SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback