FL S1718 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a public educational customer to enter into a contract for the installation, maintenance, or operation of a renewable energy source device located on property owned or controlled by the public educational customer; providing that financing arrangements for such contracts are not considered retail sales of electricity; requiring electric utilities to provide meter aggregation to public educational customers under certain circumstances; authorizing business entities or third parties contracted by such owners to install, maintain, and operate a renewable energy source device on or about the structure in which the business entity operates or on a property the business entity owns or leases, etc.
Title
Renewable Energy Sources
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Education; Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H551 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
S188 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S198 (Similar To) 2021-01-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1538 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
H1487 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
H1611 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S188 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S198 (Similar To) 2021-01-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1538 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
H1487 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
H1611 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1013 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 9151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1718 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1718/BillText/Filed/HTML |