FL S0198 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a public educational customer to enter into a contract for the installation, maintenance, or operation of a renewable energy source device on property owned or controlled by the public educational customer; providing that financing arrangements for such contracts are not considered retail sales of electricity; limiting the capacity of the renewable energy source device, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22SenateWithdrawn prior to introduction
2021-01-22SenateWithdrawn from Regulated Industries; Education; Appropriations
2020-12-15SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Education; Appropriations
2020-12-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S188 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/02/21, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
H551 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
S1538 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - Filed
S1718 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Filed
H1487 (Similar To) 2021-02-26 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101344Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36691Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36692Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403973Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback