FL S1718 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the schooner Western Union as the official state flagship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Symbols [GPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00118
2010-02-10 Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2010-02-04 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00150465Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback