FL S1678 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the task force adjunct to the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services for a specified purpose; providing for the membership and duties of the task force; requiring the department to provide staffing and administrative support to the task force; requiring the task force to submit a report to certain officials by a specified date, etc,
Title
Energy Equity Task Force
Sponsors
Senate Regulated Industries Committee | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] | Sen. Bobby Powell [D] | Sen. Loranne Ausley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/22/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-02-03 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/01/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1285 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee