FL S1662 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00679; Substituted HB 7089 -SJ 00679; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7089 (Ch. 2010-72) -SJ 00679
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00679; Substituted HB 7089 -SJ 00679; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7089 (Ch. 2010-72) -SJ 00679
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amends a provision relating to an exemption from public records and public meeting requirements for the Florida Self-Insurers Guaranty Association, Inc. Removes the scheduled repeal of certain exemptions.
Title
OGSR/Florida Self-Insurers Guaranty Association [CPSC]
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00679; Substituted HB 7089 -SJ 00679; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7089 (Ch. 2010-72) -SJ 00679 | |
2010-04-16 | Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00644 | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-14 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00636; CS read 1st time on 04/16/10 -SJ 00638 | |
2010-04-09 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/14/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-04-08 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 00114 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | |
2010-02-03 | SPB 7044 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1662) by Banking and Insurance; Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7089 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-72