FL H7089 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal under Open Government Sunset Review Act of exemptions from public records & public meetings requirements for Florida Self-Insurers Guaranty Association, Inc.
Title
OGSR/Florida Self-Insurers Guaranty Association [CPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0016 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House Roll Call No. 0793 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House Roll Call No. 0793 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-72 | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700 | |
2010-04-23 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01033 | |
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00726; Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00726 | |
2010-04-21 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00679; Substituted for CS/SB 1662 -SJ 00679; Read 2nd time -SJ 00679 | |
2010-04-20 | Received -SJ 00657 | |
2010-04-19 | In Messages; Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00657 | |
2010-04-19 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00736; Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00737 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00691 | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 00225 | |
2010-03-05 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00219 |
Same As/Similar To
S1662 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00679; Substituted HB 7089 -SJ 00679; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7089 (Ch. 2010-72) -SJ 00679