FL S1640 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting the requirement for a yacht broker to maintain a separate license for each branch office; repealing a provision relating to hearings for persons or labor organizations denied licensure as a business agent; requiring the Department of Business and Professional Regulation or a board to seek reciprocal licensing agreements with other states under certain circumstances; redefining the term "talent agency", etc.
Title
Deregulation of Professions and Occupations
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee | Sen. Ben Albritton [R] |
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/08/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 6 NAYS 4 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H27 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86)
S616 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H827 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-86, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153)
S616 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H827 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-86, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
326 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 384 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 3851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 3852 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 3855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 386 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 387 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 388 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 389 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 392 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 394 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 396 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 398 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 399 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 524 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 8314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 8414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
469 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
469 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
473 | 308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 2131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 2251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 229 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 329 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 5141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
558 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |