FL H0027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Removes regulations on specified DBPR professions, including labor organizations, hair braiders, hair wrappers & body wrappers, & boxing timekeepers & announcers; revises certain requirements for barbers, nail specialists, business organizations that provide architecture services and interior design, landscape architects, & geologists; prohibits suspension or revocation of license for delinquency or default on payment of student loan or default on requirements of work-conditional scholarship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deregulation of Professions and Occupations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseCS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2019-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-05HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-04HouseCS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 4
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-26HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 3
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-22HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-21HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 4
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 11:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1640 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
H1333 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
S616 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
H827 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
326004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44716Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
455213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4552278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458399Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468381Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468382Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468384Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4683851Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4683852Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4683855Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468386Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468387Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468388Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468389Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468394Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468396Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468398Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468399Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468410Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468524Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4688314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4688414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
473308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
474202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
474207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
474217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4812131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481223Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4812251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481229Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481329Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5535141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55374Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55379Amended CodeSee Bill Text
558002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55925Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback