FL S1598 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the "Sunshine in Government Act." Requires all elected and appointed public officials to undergo education and training on the requirements of the Sunshine in Government Act. Provides that if the nature or volume of the public record requested to be inspected or copied requires more than 30 minutes of agency resources, the agency may charge a fee for the agency resources incurred, etc.
Title
Public Records and Public Meetings [EPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-09 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00525 | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-06 | CS/CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00541 | |
2010-04-01 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00350; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-30 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-26 | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00350; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00360 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 110-S | |
2010-03-15 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 00190 | |
2010-03-11 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-09 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00190; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00245 | |
2010-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/09/10, 1:30 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00111 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1211 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0011 | 0431 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0017 | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0027 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0028 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0028 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0073 | 0155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0097 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 3188 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 002 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 003 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 0712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 0714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 131 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 133 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0163 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0257 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0257 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0281 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0286 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0286 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0286 | 0113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0286 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0286 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0364 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0382 | 0085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0383 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 2558 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0455 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0458 | 3193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0459 | 0083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0472 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0550 | 0251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0607 | 0505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0617 | 0503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0636 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0668 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0668 | 6076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0741 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0787 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0817 | 568 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0817 | 569 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0893 | 0551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0914 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 0313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 0314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |