FL H1211 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates title of ch. 119, F.S., as "Open Government Act"; includes Open Government Bill of Rights within general state policy on public records & delineates rights of persons & requirements of agencies thereunder; revises, clarifies, transfers, & reorganizes various provisions of law governing public records; revises fees for duplication of specified documents, etc.
Title
Public Records and Public Meetings
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Ford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00204 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00109 | |
2010-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1598 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0020 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0020 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0020 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0090 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0110 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 3215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 001 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 131 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 133 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0119 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0125 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0154 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0166 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 442 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 5602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0255 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0259 | 1053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0281 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0282 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0286 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0286 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0286 | 0113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0286 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0286 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 9551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 9625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 9626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 982 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 985 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0292 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0331 | 326 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0339 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0350 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0365 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 0055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0383 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0394 | 657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0394 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0395 | 1056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0395 | 3035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0395 | 3036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0395 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0397 | 419 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 0077 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0401 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0406 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0408 | 7056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 2558 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 91196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 3851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0447 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0447 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0455 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0455 | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0455 | 232 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0455 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0466 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0471 | 038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0472 | 0131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0472 | 02011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0472 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0497 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0617 | 3121 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0624 | 40851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0624 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0624 | 86 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 0628 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 3121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 6488 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 724 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0631 | 932 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0633 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0641 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0641 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0655 | 0321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0723 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0741 | 3165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0766 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0910 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0910 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 0314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0945 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0945 | 6032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0951 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 8025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1000 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 447 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 4472 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1005 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |