FL S1558 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to require payment of an application fee for registration in the state hemp program; authorizing the department to waive registration fees by rule; requiring fee proceeds to be deposited into a specified trust fund, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/State Hemp Program Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Agriculture; Rules
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1020 (Related) 2019-04-16 - CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
S7088 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581084Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback