FL S1540 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for licensure of recovery care centers by the Agency for Health Care Administration; providing criteria for the admission of patients to recovery care centers; requiring the agency to adopt rules establishing separate, minimum standards for the care and treatment of patients in recovery care centers; providing applicability of the Health Care Licensing Procedures Act to recovery care centers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recovery Care Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H25 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
H7083 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
H843 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-138, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
385211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944787Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39510973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409975Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback