FL H0843 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Dental Student Loan Repayment Program to support dentists who practice in public health programs located in certain underserved areas; requiring the Department of Health to establish the Donated Dental Services Program to provide comprehensive dental care to certain eligible individuals; requiring a hospital to notify a patient's primary care provider within a specified timeframe after the patient's admission; requiring a licensed facility, upon placing a patient on observation status, to immediately notify the patient of such status using a specified form; prohibiting certain health maintenance organizations from employing step-therapy protocols under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#289 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#72 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25 Approved by Governor
2019-06-25 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-29HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-04-29HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2019-04-29HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (565298) 1008
2019-04-29HouseIn returning messages
2019-04-29SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-26SenateAmendment(s) adopted (565298)
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 7078
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-04HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-03HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-07HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-07HouseFavorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 843
H7 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-105
H25 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H319 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H465 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
H559 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H813 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H1207 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
H1243 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S434 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
S716 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S882 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S1126 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
S1520 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7
S1540 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S7080 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3814019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38140195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
542336Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62427Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/Amendment/241377/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/Amendment/623018/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/Amendment/101388/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/Amendment/723844/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/Amendment/300672/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/Amendment/963412/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/Amendment/565298/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/Vote/HouseVote_h00843c1072.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/Vote/SenateVote_h00843c1008.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/843/Vote/HouseVote_h00843c1289.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback