FL H0025 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes ambulatory surgical centers to provide advanced birth services if specified requirements are met; provides for licensure of recovery care centers by AHCA; provides criteria for admission of patients to recovery care centers; requires recovery care centers to have specified protocols; requires agency to adopt minimum standards for recovery care centers & ambulatory surgical centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ambulatory Care Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#211 (Y: 78 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-24SenateIn Messages
2019-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 78 NAYS 38
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2019-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23HouseAmendment(s) failed (249287, 516069) 776
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-04HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-04HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-03HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 4
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-19HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-19HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-13HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1540 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
H7083 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
H843 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-138, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
385211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944787Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39510973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409975Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback