FL H7083 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for licensure of recovery care centers by AHCA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensure Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#201 (Y: 84 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#197 (Y: 69 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-24SenateIn Messages
2019-04-24HousePassed; YEAS 84 NAYS 30
2019-04-24HouseMotion to reconsider adopted
2019-04-24HouseFailed to pass; YEAS 69 NAYS 45
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-03HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H25 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
S1540 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408802Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback