FL S1496 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the elements that constitute murder in the first degree and murder in the second degree; revising the elements that constitute felony murder, for murder in the second degree; deleting provisions relating to felony murder, for murder in the third degree; authorizing a person convicted under certain murder provisions to file a petition with the sentencing court to have his or her murder conviction vacated or to be resentenced, as applicable, on or after a specified date, etc.
Title
Murder
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1496 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1496/BillText/Filed/HTML |