FL S1486 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that an exception to the commission of the offense of unlawful exposure of sexual organs includes clothing-optional beaches; requiring the Division of Recreation and Parks of the Department of Environmental Protection to amend a specified rule to comply with this act, etc.
Title
Clothing-optional Locations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Now in Environment and Natural Resources |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/09/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1253 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee