FL S1424 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7039 (Ch. 2023-108)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7039 (Ch. 2023-108)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the responsibilities of the Just Read, Florida! Office; providing that a charter school application must include certain reading instructional strategies; providing that district school board instructional materials must include certain reading instructional strategies; revising requirements for an individualized progress monitoring plan; requiring a school district to evaluate the students at the end of each grading period for a mathematics deficiency; revising training requirements for reading coaches, classroom teachers, and school administrators to include certain instructional strategies, etc.
Title
Student Outcomes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Education (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Education (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7039 (Ch. 2023-108) |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 7039 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S758 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7039 (Ch. 2023-108)
H7039 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-108
H7039 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-108
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 485 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 283 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 2125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |