FL S1420 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for the personal identifying and location information of current and former county attorneys, deputy county attorneys, assistant county attorneys, city attorneys, deputy city attorneys, and assistant city attorneys, and the names and personal identifying and location information of the spouses and children of such attorneys; providing applicability; providing for retroactive application; providing for future legislative review and repeal; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/County and City Attorneys
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-09 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1213 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee