FL H1213 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying & location information of current & former county attorneys, assistant county attorneys, deputy county attorneys, city attorneys, assistant city attorneys, & deputy city attorneys & names & personal identifying & location information of spouses & children of such attorneys; provides exception; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Current or Former County and City Attorneys
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1420 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1213 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1213/BillText/Filed/PDF |