FL S1408 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the general and professional liability insurance coverage that must be maintained by a licensed nursing home to meet certain criteria; repealing provisions relating to punitive damages and limitations on awards, etc.
Title
Nursing Home Liability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H655 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
S896 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
H1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
S896 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
H1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 0238 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0239 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1408 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1408/BillText/Filed/HTML |