FL H0655 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires public utilities to prioritize certain health care facilities for restoration of power in emergencies; requires such facilities to have operational emergency power source & sufficient fuel supply; requires Office of the State Long-Term Care Ombudsman to conduct unannounced quality-of-care evaluations of certain health & long-term care facilities; authorizes AHCA to impose specified civil penalties & administrative fines for certain violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing Homes and Related Health Care Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health Innovation Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-11-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H327 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
H479 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
S284 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
S372 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
S896 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
H933 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
S1260 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
S1408 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1874 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H245 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1321 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
366042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000069Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000078Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000083Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000223Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000238Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000239Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4001185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4001411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429298Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42934Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42941Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback