FL S0284 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to determine compliance with standards for electricity and emergency power sources during the routine inspection of a licensed nursing home facility; requiring the agency, in consultation with the Department of Health and the Department of Elderly Affairs, to adopt and enforce rules requiring a licensed nursing home facility to have adequate electrical equipment, an emergency power source, and a supply of fuel which meets a specified criterion, etc.
Title
Nursing Home and Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-29 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S372 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
H327 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
H479 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
H655 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
S896 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
H933 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
S1260 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
S1874 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H327 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
H479 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
H655 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
S896 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
H933 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
S1260 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
S1874 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/284 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/284/BillText/Filed/HTML |