FL S0896 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Florida Public Service Commission to ensure that public utilities effectively prioritize the restoration of services to certain health care facilities in the event of emergencies; establishing an Office of the State Long-Term Care Ombudsman within the Department of Elderly Affairs to administer the State Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program; requiring the Office of the State Long-Term Care Ombudsman to conduct unannounced quality-of-care evaluations of certain health and long-term care facilities; requiring nursing homes to allow residents, and certain individuals on their behalf, to monitor the residents' rooms through the use of electronic monitoring devices, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing Homes and Related Health Care Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules
2017-11-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H655 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Introduced
H327 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Introduced
H479 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Introduced
S284 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Introduced
S372 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Introduced
H933 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Introduced
S1260 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Introduced
S1408 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
S1874 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules
H245 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1321 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
366042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000069Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000078Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000083Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000223Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000238Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000239Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4001185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4001411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429298Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42934Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42941Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback