FL S1384 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "The Urban and Inner-City Crime and Gun Violence Prevention Act"; creating the Urban and Inner-City Crime and Gun Violence Commission; requiring the executive director of the Department of Law Enforcement to issue subpoenas to aid the commission in specified ways; authorizing the commission to access certain confidential and exempt information or records, etc.
Title
Urban and Inner-City Crime and Gun Violence Prevention Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1097 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1384 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1384/BillText/Filed/HTML |