FL H1097 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Urban & Inner-City Crime & Gun Violence Prevention Commission; provides for membership, staff support & requirements for meetings; specifies duties; provides for powers of commission; authorizes commission to access certain confidential & exempt information or records; requires reports; provides for sunset of commission.
Title
Urban and Inner-City Crime and Gun Violence Prevention Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1384 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1097 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1097/BillText/Filed/PDF |