FL S1376 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding conditions under which a ceding insurer must be allowed credit for reinsurance; specifying requirements for assuming insurers and reinsurance agreements; authorizing a ceding insurer or its representative that is subject to rehabilitation, liquidation, or conservation to seek a certain court order; authorizing the Office of Insurance Regulation to revoke or suspend an assuming insurer's eligibility under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Credit For Reinsurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-10 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1211 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar