FL H1211 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers specified powers & duties of Commissioner of Insurance Regulation to OIR; requires credits for reinsurance to be allowed to ceding insurers; provides requirements for assuming insurers in order for such credits to be allowed; requires assuming insurers to have & maintain on ongoing basis minimum capital & surplus, or its equivalent, and, if applicable, minimum capital & surplus equivalents & central fund; requires assuming insurers to have & maintain on ongoing basis minimum solvency or capital ratio; requires assuming insurers to provide security in specified amount; authorizes ceding insurers & their representatives to seek orders requiring assuming insurers to post security for certain liabilities; authorizes office to revoke & suspend eligibility of assuming insurers under specified circumstance.
Title
Credit for Reinsurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-20 | House | CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1376 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar