FL S1274 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding sickle cell disease to the list of qualifying medical conditions for medical use of marijuana, etc.
Title
Qualifying Medical Conditions for Medical Use of Marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Rules |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H645 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1274 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1274/BillText/Filed/HTML |