FL S1274 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 841
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting a provision prohibiting an association from hiring an attorney who represents the management company of the association; revising the list of documents that the association is required to post online; revising voting requirements relating to alterations and additions to certain common elements or association property; revising cooperative association recordkeeping

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 841
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 841
2018-03-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (166454)
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2018-02-13SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-13SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2018-02-01SenateNow in Community Affairs
2018-02-01SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-30SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/30/18, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-12-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H841 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-96
S1530 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7183026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7183027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720401Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback