FL H0841 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising condominium association recordkeeping and financial reporting requirements; revising provisions relating to required association bylaws; revising board term limits; revising voting requirements relating to alterations and additions to certain common elements or association property; providing that an association may not prohibit a unit owner from installing an electronic vehicle charging station; providing when the installation of an electronic vehicle charging station may be the basis of a lien; revising requirements to serve as a board member; requiring an association to follow certain procedures when amending a governing document, etc.
Title
Community Associations
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee | House Careers and Competition Subcommittee | Rep. George Moraitis [R] |
Rep. Matthew Caldwell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#906 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#55 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#70 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#721 (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#55 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#70 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#721 (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Chapter No. 2018-96 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-09 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2018-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 100 NAYS 1 |
2018-03-09 | House | Concurred in 3 amendment(s) (289590, 346340, 549860) |
2018-03-09 | House | In returning messages |
2018-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 1 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (289590, 549860) 1026 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (894894) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (346340) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1274 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 4 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment(s) failed (179591, 903525, 929187) |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (028261, 729193) 721 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-15 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 2 |
2018-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/15/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-02-05 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Commerce Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | CS/CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-31 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-30 | House | CS/CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-25 | House | Now in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2018-01-23 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-23 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-11-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1274 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 841
S1530 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118
S1530 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
194 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 3026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 3027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |