FL S1240 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising an exemption from public records requirements for a financial statement that a governmental entity or agency requires a person to submit in order to respond to a competitive solicitation or as a term or condition of a contract; providing exceptions; providing for future review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Personal Financial Statement/Contract Bidding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/25/14, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1167 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1240 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1240/BillText/Filed/HTML |